WI SB719 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: modifying administrative rules relating to the use of wood to contain bear bait in stumps.
Title
Modifying administrative rules relating to the use of wood to contain bear bait in stumps.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tiffany |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Representative Milroy added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb719 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB719.pdf |