WI SB718 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 11.0104 (1) (b), 11.0104 (4) and 11.1302; to renumber and amend 11.1103 (1) and 11.1103 (2); to amend 11.0101 (7), 11.0102 (2) (a), 11.0104 (1) (a), 11.0104 (2), 11.0104 (3), 11.0104 (5), 11.0105 (1) (a), 11.0201 (4), 11.0204 (1) (a) 7. (intro.), 11.0204 (2) (c), 11.0204 (3) (b), 11.0204 (4) (c), 11.0204 (4) (d), 11.0204 (5) (b), 11.0204 (5) (c), 11.0204 (6) (a), 11.0204 (6) (b), 11.0204 (7), 11.0304 (1) (a) 7. (intro.), 11.0304 (2) (c), 11.0304 (3) (b), 11.0304 (4) (c), 11.0304 (4) (d), 11.0304 (5) (b), 11.0304 (5) (c), 11.0304 (7), 11.0404 (1) (a) 7. (intro.), 11.0404 (2) (c), 11.0404 (2) (d), 11.0404 (3) (b), 11.0404 (3) (c), 11.0404 (4), 11.0504 (1) (a) 7. (intro.), 11.0504 (2) (c), 11.0504 (3) (b), 11.0504 (4) (c), 11.0504 (4) (d), 11.0504 (5) (b), 11.0504 (5) (c), 11.0604 (1) (a) 7. (intro.), 11.0604 (2) (c), 11.0604 (3) (b), 11.0604 (4) (c), 11.0604 (4) (d), 11.0604 (5) (b), 11.0604 (5) (c), 11.0704 (2), 11.0704 (3) (a), 11.0704 (4) (a), 11.0704 (4) (b), 11.0704 (5) (a), 11.0704 (5) (b), 11.0804 (1) (a) 6. (intro.), 11.0804 (2) (c), 11.0804 (3) (b), 11.0804 (4) (c), 11.0804 (4) (d), 11.0804 (5) (b), 11.0804 (5) (c), 11.0904 (1) (a) 7. (intro.), 11.0904 (2) (c), 11.0904 (3) (b), 11.0904 (4) (c), 11.0904 (4) (d), 11.0904 (5) (b), 11.0904 (5) (c), 11.1113 (3) and 11.1303 (2) (a); to repeal and recreate 11.0505 (1) (a), 11.0605 (1) (a) and 11.1001 (1) (a); and to create 11.0101 (7m), 11.0103 (3) (a) 4., 11.0104 (1) (bm) to (e), 11.0204 (4) (e), 11.0204 (5) (cm), 11.0204 (6) (c), 11.0304 (4) (e), 11.0304 (5) (cm), 11.0404 (2) (e), 11.0404 (3) (cm), 11.0504 (4) (e), 11.0504 (5) (cm), 11.0604 (4) (e), 11.0604 (5) (cm), 11.0704 (4) (c), 11.0704 (5) (bm), 11.0804 (4) (e), 11.0804 (5) (d), 11.0904 (4) (e), 11.0904 (5) (d), 11.1103 (1) (a) and (b), 11.1103 (2) (a) and (b) and 11.1103 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: campaign finance changes recommended by the Ethics Commission.
Title
Campaign finance changes recommended by the Ethics Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Rep. John Spiros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Senate | Published 4-16-2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-15-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 265 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:48 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Introduced |