WI SB717 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.45 (59m), 49.471 (4m) and 601.59 of the statutes; Relating to: BadgerCare purchase option, basic plan, state-based insurance exchange, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
BadgerCare purchase option, basic plan, state-based insurance exchange, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Representative Goyke added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb717 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/SB717.pdf |