WI SB71 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 165.77 (7) and 175.405; to amend 165.845 (title), 165.845 (1) (a), 165.845 (1) (b) and 165.845 (2); and to create 165.775, 165.845 (1) (d) and 895.537 of the statutes; Relating to: storage and processing of sexual assault kits and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Storage and processing of sexual assault kits and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Published 12-7-2021 |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 116 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-11-16 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-11-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-11 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-11-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-11-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-11 | House | Read a second time |
2021-11-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-14 | House | Representatives Bowen and Shelton added as cosponsors |
2021-10-06 | House | Senator Jacque added as a coauthor |
2021-09-29 | House | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |