WI SB704 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 6.47 (4) (b), 165.68 (1) (b), 165.68 (3) (b) 4. a., 165.68 (3) (b) 4. b., 165.68 (3) (b) 4. e. and 183.0105 (1) (intro.); and to create 165.68 (5) (e), 165.68 (5) (f) and 165.68 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: address confidentiality, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Address confidentiality, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Published 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 144 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:16 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |