WI SB703 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 102.07 (8) (a); and to create 73.03 (75), 102.07 (8) (bs), 104.01 (5k), 104.013, 108.02 (12) (cm), 109.01 (2m) and 109.013 of the statutes; Relating to: classification of motor vehicle operators as independent contractors or employees.
Title
Classification of motor vehicle operators as independent contractors or employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Tyler August [R] | Rep. John Macco [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] |
Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | LRB correction |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:41 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 11 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 20, Noes 11 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Introduced |