WI SB70 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Published 7-9-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 73.03 (75) of the statutes; Relating to: disclosure of information regarding state revenue. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure of information regarding state revenue. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09SenatePublished 7-9-2021
2021-07-09SenateReport approved by the Governor on 7-8-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 66
2021-07-06SenatePresented to the Governor on 7-6-2021
2021-06-28SenateReport correctly enrolled
2021-06-22SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2021-06-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-06-22HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0
2021-06-22HouseRules suspended
2021-06-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-06-22HouseRead a second time
2021-06-22HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2021-06-16HousePlaced on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-06-15HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2021-05-25HouseRepresentative Drake added as a cosponsor
2021-05-18HouseRepresentative L. Myers added as a cosponsor
2021-05-11HouseReceived from Senate
2021-05-11SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-05-11SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended
2021-05-11SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-05-11SenateRead a second time
2021-05-07SenatePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-04-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-04-13SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2021-04-13SenateExecutive action taken
2021-04-12SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-11SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-02-05SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue
2021-02-05SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback