WI SB689 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 74.41 (4) (b); to consolidate, renumber and amend 74.41 (4) (intro.) and (a); to amend 74.41 (1) (intro.), 74.41 (5) (a) and 74.41 (5) (b); and to create 74.41 (1m) and 74.41 (4r) of the statutes; Relating to: the charge-back of rescinded or refunded property taxes. (FE)
Title
The charge-back of rescinded or refunded property taxes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Gudex |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb689 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB689.pdf |