WI SB684 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 980.01 (11) and 980.08 (6m); and to create 980.08 (6p) (b) and (c) of the statutes; Relating to: definition of youth center for purposes of placing a sexually violent person on supervised release and notification requirements for such placements. (FE)
Title
Definition of youth center for purposes of placing a sexually violent person on supervised release and notification requirements for such placements. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] |
Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Introduced |