WI SB660 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: Senate Labor and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 7.33 (4), 13.111 (2), 16.50 (3) (e), 19.82 (1), 19.85 (3), 19.86, 20.425 (1) (a), 20.425 (1) (i), 20.505 (1) (ks), 20.505 (1) (kz), 20.917 (3) (b), 20.921 (1) (a) 2., 20.923 (6) (intro.), 36.09 (1) (j), 40.02 (25) (b) 8., 40.05 (4g) (a) 4., 40.80 (3), 40.81 (3), 111.70 (1) (a), 111.70 (1) (fm), 111.70 (1) (j), 111.70 (3) (a) 5., 111.70 (3) (a) 6., 111.70 (4) (cg) (title), 1. to 5. and 6. a., 111.70 (4) (cg) 7r. d., 111.70 (4) (cg) 7r. e., 111.70 (4) (cg) 7r. f., 111.70 (4) (cg) 7r. h., 111.70 (4) (cg) 8m., 111.70 (4) (d) 1., 111.70 (4) (d) 2. a., 111.70 (4) (p), 111.70 (7m) (c) 1. a., 111.81 (1), 111.81 (9g), 111.81 (12m), 111.81 (16), 111.825 (5), 111.83 (1), 111.83 (5) (d), 111.83 (5) (e), 111.83 (5) (f), 111.84 (1) (f), 111.85 (1) (a), 111.85 (1) (b), 111.85 (1) (c), 111.85 (1) (d), 111.85 (2) (a), 111.85 (2) (b), 111.85 (4), 111.91 (1) (a), 111.91 (1) (b), 111.91 (1) (c), 111.93 (3) (a), 230.01 (3), 230.046 (10) (a), 230.12 (3) (e) 1., 230.35 (2d) (e), 230.35 (3) (e) 6. and 230.88 (2) (b); and to create 111.70 (1) (cn), 111.70 (1) (om) and subchapter VI of chapter 111 [precedes 111.95] of the statutes; Relating to: collective bargaining for employees of school districts, employees of cooperative educational service agencies, employees of technical college districts, and employees of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective bargaining for employees of school districts, employees of cooperative educational service agencies, employees of technical college districts, and employees of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-11-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-11-16SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-11-05SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-11-02SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
2021-11-02SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback