WI SB654 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 89.073 (2) (e) and 440.09 (2) (e); to renumber and amend 89.073 (1) and 440.09 (1); to amend 89.073 (title), 89.073 (2) (intro.), 89.073 (2) (a), 89.073 (2) (b), 89.073 (3), 440.09 (title), 440.09 (2) (b) and 440.09 (3); and to create 89.073 (1) (a), 89.073 (2) (f), 89.073 (4), 89.073 (5), 440.09 (1) (a), 440.09 (2) (f), 440.09 (4) and 440.09 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: reciprocal credentials for service members, former service members, and their spouses and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Reciprocal credentials for service members, former service members, and their spouses and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb654 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB654.pdf |