WI SB651 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 301.20; to amend 16.99 (3b) and 301.16 (1x); and to create 301.01 (4m), 301.16 (1f), 301.16 (1w), 301.18 (1) (fm) and 302.01 (13) of the statutes; Relating to: establishing regional Type 1 juvenile correctional facilities and converting Lincoln Hills to an adult correctional facility. (FE)
Title
Establishing regional Type 1 juvenile correctional facilities and converting Lincoln Hills to an adult correctional facility. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb651 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB651.pdf |