WI SB645 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 138.10 (9) and 138.10 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: the method of sending notices by pawnbrokers and modifying rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The method of sending notices by pawnbrokers and modifying rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2022-02-18SenateAvailable for scheduling
2022-02-18SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2022-02-16SenateExecutive action taken
2022-02-10SenatePublic hearing held
2022-01-24SenateRepresentative Cabrera added as a cosponsor
2021-11-03SenateRepresentative Knodl added as a cosponsor
2021-10-20SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues
2021-10-20SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback