WI SB644 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 11.1303 (title); and to create 11.1303 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: disclosures regarding content generated by artificial intelligence in political advertisements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosures regarding content generated by artificial intelligence in political advertisements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-02-20SenateRepresentative Shankland added as a cosponsor
2024-02-20SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn
2024-02-15SenateAvailable for scheduling
2024-02-15SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2024-02-15SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2024-02-15SenateExecutive action taken
2024-02-08SenatePublic hearing held
2024-02-06SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn
2024-01-12SenateRepresentative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
2023-11-27SenateFiscal estimate received
2023-11-27SenateRepresentative Haywood added as a cosponsor
2023-11-15SenateRepresentative Subeck added as a cosponsor
2023-11-07SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
2023-11-07SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback