WI SB643 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 448.05 (2) (b) 2.; to amend 448.05 (2) (b) 1., 448.05 (2) (b) 4. a., 448.05 (2) (b) 4. b. and 448.05 (2) (b) 5.; and to create 448.01 (4), 448.01 (9e) and 448.05 (2) (b) 4. c. of the statutes; Relating to: qualification of international medical graduates to practice medicine and surgery. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualification of international medical graduates to practice medicine and surgery. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2022-01-07SenateRepresentative Wichgers added as a cosponsor
2021-11-15SenateRepresentative Murphy added as a cosponsor
2021-11-04SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-10-27SenatePublic hearing held
2021-10-20SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry
2021-10-20SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback