WI SB634 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 104.001 (3), 111.31 (5) and 111.337 (3); to amend 111.371 (intro.); and to create 66.0134, 66.0408 (2) (d), 103.007, 103.12, 103.36, 109.09 (3), 111.315 and 947.21 of the statutes; Relating to: preventing the state or local governments from requiring any person to accept certain collective bargaining provisions or waive its rights under the National Labor Relations Act or state labor law; prohibiting local regulation of employee hours and overtime, employment benefits, wage claims and collections, an employer's right to solicit salary information of prospective employees, employment discrimination, and professions regulated by the state; and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Preventing the state or local governments from requiring any person to accept certain collective bargaining provisions or waive its rights under the National Labor Relations Act or state labor law; prohibiting local regulation of employee hours and overtime, employment benefits, wage claims and collections, an employer's right to solicit salary information of prospective employees, employment discrimination, and professions regulated by the state; and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Representative Gundrum added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb634 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB634.pdf |