WI SB633 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 29.184 (4) (b) and 29.185 (6) (c) 3.; and to amend 95.21 (2) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: required tags for a dog hunting bear or wolf or training to hunt.
Title
Required tags for a dog hunting bear or wolf or training to hunt.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Testin [R] | Sen. Rob Stafsholt [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] |
Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb633 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB633.pdf |