WI SB632 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.04 (3) (e) 1.; and to create 125.04 (3) (bm), 125.04 (3) (j), 125.04 (6) (g), 134.65 (1r) and 134.65 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: applications for alcohol beverage licenses and permits and for cigarette and tobacco products retailer licenses, appointment of corporate agents of alcohol beverage licensees and permittees, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Applications for alcohol beverage licenses and permits and for cigarette and tobacco products retailer licenses, appointment of corporate agents of alcohol beverage licensees and permittees, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb632 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB632.pdf |