WI SB629 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 103.79 (1); to renumber and amend 103.79 (2); and to amend 103.67 (2) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: minor golf caddies. (FE)
Title
Minor golf caddies. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Representative Wittke added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb629 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB629.pdf |