WI SB626 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 452.05 (1) (h) and 452.07 (2); to renumber 111.335 (1) (a), 111.335 (1) (cg) 1., 111.335 (1) (cg) 2., 111.335 (1) (cg) 3., 111.335 (1) (cs), 111.335 (1) (cx) and 111.335 (1) (d) 2.; to renumber and amend 111.335 (1) (b), 111.335 (1) (c), 111.335 (1) (cm), 111.335 (1) (cv) and 111.335 (1) (d) 1.; to amend 440.03 (13) (d), 452.139 (3) and 452.25 (2) (a); to repeal and recreate 440.03 (13) (bm) and 440.03 (13) (d); and to create 111.335 (1m), 111.335 (2) (title), 111.335 (3) (title) and 111.335 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: discrimination based on arrest or conviction record under the fair employment law. (FE)
Title
Discrimination based on arrest or conviction record under the fair employment law. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb626 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB626.pdf |