WI SB625 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 341.35 (1); and to create 341.35 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring a local referendum to impose a wheel tax. (FE)
Title
Requiring a local referendum to impose a wheel tax. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] |
Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] | Rep. John Macco [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb625 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB625.pdf |