WI SB624 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.79 (7g) of the statutes; Relating to: photo identification cards for FoodShare recipients. (FE)
Title
Photo identification cards for FoodShare recipients. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb624 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB624.pdf |