WI SB624 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Published 5-24-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Published 5-24-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0627 (title), 66.0627 (1) (a) and 66.0627 (8); and to create 66.0627 (1) (d) of the statutes; relating to: expanding the authority of political subdivisions to make residential energy efficiency improvement loans, and authorizing political subdivisions to make water efficiency improvement loans and impose special charges for the loans.
Title
Expanding the authority of political subdivisions to make residential energy efficiency improvement loans, and authorizing political subdivisions to make water efficiency improvement loans and impose special charges for the loans.
Sponsors
Rep. David Cullen [D] | Rep. Jason Fields [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] | Rep. James Soletski [D] |
Sen. Jim Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Published 5-24-2010 | |
2010-05-10 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-10-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 272 | |
2010-05-06 | Presented to the Governor on 5-6-2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Report correctly enrolled on 5-6-2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Made a special order of business at 11:58 A.M. on 4-22-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 | |
2010-04-20 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-20 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Senator Lassa added as a coauthor | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on calendar 4-20-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-14 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-14 | Report passage recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-14 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-08 | Public hearing held | |
2010-04-06 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-26 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-17 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2010-03-17 | Introduced |