WI SB619 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 20.115 (4) (t) and 93.60 of the statutes; Relating to: a transition to grass pilot program and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A transition to grass pilot program and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-01-30SenatePublic hearing held
2024-01-18SenateRepresentative Emerson added as a cosponsor
2023-11-30SenateFiscal estimate received
2023-11-15SenateLRB correction
2023-11-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James
2023-11-07SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism
2023-11-07SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback