WI SB617 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: Department of Natural Resources report on partnering with the private aquaculture industry. (FE)
Title
Department of Natural Resources report on partnering with the private aquaculture industry. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Environment |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate requested from the Legislative Fiscal Bureau, by the committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 96 (1), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |