WI SB617 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.03 (2) (i) 3., 71.03 (4) (b), 71.54 (4), 71.65 (1) (a) 2., 71.65 (2) (a), 71.71 (1) (a) 2., 71.71 (2), 71.715 (1) (a) 2., 71.715 (2), 71.74 (11), 71.74 (14), 71.80 (2), 71.80 (12) (a) 2., 71.80 (12) (b) 2., 71.80 (12) (c) 2. a., 71.80 (16) (b), 71.91 (6) (c) 2., 71.91 (6) (f) 1., 71.91 (7) (b), 71.91 (7) (h), 73.0301 (2) (b) 1. b., 73.0302 (2), 73.09 (4) (c), 73.09 (5), 73.09 (6), 73.13 (2) (c), 77.51 (11d), 77.52 (11), 77.52 (18) (bm), 77.59 (3), 77.59 (7), 77.9961 (3), 78.65 (1), 139.096, 139.77 (3), 139.77 (4), 177.24 (2), 812.04 (2), 812.05 (1), 812.05 (2), 812.13 (1) and 812.39 (1); and to create 73.03 (73) and 77.59 (5r) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a penalty applicable to a seller that continues to collect sales tax erroneously on a product after receiving two or more written notices that the product is not taxable; certification of property assessors; use of social security numbers on certain tax documents; electronic delivery of notices by the Department of Revenue; and the responsibility for fees and disbursements in garnishment actions. (FE)
Title
Creating a penalty applicable to a seller that continues to collect sales tax erroneously on a product after receiving two or more written notices that the product is not taxable; certification of property assessors; use of social security numbers on certain tax documents; electronic delivery of notices by the Department of Revenue; and the responsibility for fees and disbursements in garnishment actions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb617 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB617.pdf |