WI SB604 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 767.54; to amend 767.553 (1) (c); and to create 767.54 (1) (a) to (d) and 767.54 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: the required annual exchange of financial information in an order for family support, child support, or maintenance.
Title
The required annual exchange of financial information in an order for family support, child support, or maintenance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Senate | Published 4-16-2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-15-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 259 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Senator Marklein withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Introduced |