WI SB6 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: requirements for a school board to close a school building to in-person instruction for more than 14 consecutive days during the 2020-21 and 2021-22 school years and a school board requirement to offer a full-time, in-person option to all pupils. (FE)
Title
Requirements for a school board to close a school building to in-person instruction for more than 14 consecutive days during the 2020-21 and 2021-22 school years and a school board requirement to offer a full-time, in-person option to all pupils. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senator Jacque added as a coauthor |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced |