WI SB598 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 43.30 (4); and to create 43.30 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: parental notification related to public library materials. (FE)
Title
Parental notification related to public library materials. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Introduced |