WI SB597 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.27 (3n) (a) 1m. a., 36.27 (3n) (a) 1m. b., 36.27 (3n) (b) (intro.), 36.27 (3n) (bd), 36.27 (3n) (bg), 36.27 (3n) (bm), 36.27 (3n) (c), 36.27 (3p) (a) 1r. (intro.), 38.24 (7) (a) 1m. a., 38.24 (7) (a) 1m. b., 38.24 (7) (a) 1p., 38.24 (7) (b) (intro.), 38.24 (7) (bd), 38.24 (7) (bg), 38.24 (7) (bm) and 38.24 (8) (a) 1r. (intro.); and to create 36.27 (3n) (a) 1r. of the statutes; Relating to: tuition and fee remission for certain veterans and their dependents enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or a technical college. (FE)
Title
Tuition and fee remission for certain veterans and their dependents enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or a technical college. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb597 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB597.pdf |