WI SB59 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: state finances and appropriations, constituting the executive budget act of the 2019 legislature.
Title
State finances and appropriations, constituting the executive budget act of the 2019 legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-26-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Agency briefing held |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Agency briefing held |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Retirement Systems requested |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb59 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB59.pdf |