WI SB589 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Published 4-1-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Published 4-1-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.19 (14) (a) and 118.194 (1) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: the Foundations of Reading test licensure requirement.
Title
The Foundations of Reading test licensure requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Published 4-1-2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-31-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 214 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-28-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 2 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson, Johnson and Smith |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Introduced |