WI SB587 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 20.255 (2) (fw); and to create 20.255 (2) (fw) of the statutes; Relating to: state aid payments for pupils in grades kindergarten to 12 who transfer schools due to the existence or absence of mandates regarding pupil face coverings or COVID-19 vaccines; school district membership in an interscholastic athletic association in the 2021-22 school year; and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State aid payments for pupils in grades kindergarten to 12 who transfer schools due to the existence or absence of mandates regarding pupil face coverings or COVID-19 vaccines; school district membership in an interscholastic athletic association in the 2021-22 school year; and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2021-11-12SenateRepresentative Brooks added as a cosponsor
2021-10-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-10-21SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-10-21SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3
2021-10-21SenateExecutive action taken
2021-10-14SenatePublic hearing held
2021-09-27SenateRepresentative Wichgers added as a cosponsor
2021-09-24SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2021-09-24SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback