WI SB584 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 86.19 (1g) (i) of the statutes; Relating to: erecting highway signs for The Prairie School in Racine County. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Erecting highway signs for The Prairie School in Racine County. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-03-06SenateAvailable for scheduling
2024-03-06SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2024-03-06SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2024-03-05SenateExecutive action taken
2024-02-06SenatePublic hearing held
2024-01-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2023-12-18SenateFiscal estimate received
2023-10-30SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
2023-10-30SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback