WI SB578 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.016 (1) (a); to amend 118.016 (1) (b); and to create 118.016 (1) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: assessments to evaluate reading readiness. (FE)
Title
Assessments to evaluate reading readiness. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb578 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB578.pdf |