WI SB570 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 895.5268 of the statutes; Relating to: limiting civil liability for firearm, firearm accessory, and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, and dealers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting civil liability for firearm, firearm accessory, and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, and dealers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-17SenateFailed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
2022-05-17SenatePlaced on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
2022-04-15SenateReport vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022
2022-04-14SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-14-2022
2022-03-02SenateReport correctly enrolled
2022-02-23SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2022-02-23HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2022-02-23HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 61, Noes 35, Paired 2
2022-02-23HouseRules suspended
2022-02-23HouseOrdered to a third reading
2022-02-23HouseRead a second time
2022-02-22HouseMade a special order of business at 8:25 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
2021-12-07HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2021-11-15HouseRepresentative Murphy added as a cosponsor
2021-11-08HouseReceived from Senate
2021-11-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-11-08SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12
2021-11-08SenateRules suspended
2021-11-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-11-08SenateRead a second time
2021-11-05SenatePlaced on calendar 11-8-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-10-28SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-10-28SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2
2021-10-28SenateExecutive action taken
2021-10-14SenatePublic hearing held
2021-10-13SenateSenator Wanggaard added as a coauthor
2021-10-11SenateRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-09-24SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-09-24SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback