WI SB569 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.54 (7m) of the statutes; Relating to: the sales tax exemption for entertainment admission sales by nonprofit organizations. (FE)
Title
The sales tax exemption for entertainment admission sales by nonprofit organizations. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Kelda Roys [D] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] |
Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Rep. Marisabel Cabrera [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Published 3-12-2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-11-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 167 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-10-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:26 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Representative Conley added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Introduced |