WI SB564 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 301.323 of the statutes; Relating to: vendors at state correctional institutions. (FE)
Title
Vendors at state correctional institutions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Senate | Published 4-16-2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-15-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 264 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2022-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tusler |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-17-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 1 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senator Stroebel withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Representative James added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Senator Stroebel added as a coauthor |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Senator Roys added as a coauthor |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Representative Mursau added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Introduced |