WI SB562 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.46 (1) (a) 1m., 49.46 (1) (j), 49.47 (4) (ag) 2., 49.471 (6) (b) and 49.471 (7) (b) 1.; and to create 49.471 (6) (L) of the statutes; Relating to: extension of eligibility under the Medical Assistance program for postpartum women. (FE)
Title
Extension of eligibility under the Medical Assistance program for postpartum women. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Representative Hesselbein added as a cosponsor |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Representatives Vining and Spreitzer added as cosponsors |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Senator Smith added as a coauthor |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Representatives Sinicki and Snodgrass added as cosponsors |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Senator Agard added as a coauthor |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Representative Krug added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Representative Armstrong added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Representatives Allen and Conley added as cosponsors |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Representative Hong added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Representative Drake added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Introduced |