WI SB56 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 125.25 (3), 125.26 (3), 125.272, 125.51 (2) (c), 125.51 (3) (d) and 125.51 (6); to amend 125.02 (20), 125.26 (2u), 125.26 (2w), 125.26 (2x), 125.51 (3) (bu), 125.51 (3) (bw) and 125.51 (3) (bx); and to create 125.10 (6), 125.272 (2) and 125.51 (6) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: remote orders for the sale of alcohol beverages to be picked up on retail licensed premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remote orders for the sale of alcohol beverages to be picked up on retail licensed premises.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseReceived from Senate
2021-03-23SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-23SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-03-23SenateRules suspended
2021-03-23SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-23SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2021-03-23SenateRead a second time
2021-03-23SenateRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up
2021-03-19SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-03-19SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2021-03-19SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2021-03-19SenateExecutive action taken
2021-03-16SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2021-02-10SenateRepresentative Tranel added as a cosponsor
2021-02-04SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-03SenateSenators Ballweg and Cowles added as coauthors
2021-02-02SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback