WI SB558 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 943.01 (2) (e) and 943.017 (2) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: damage or graffiti to certain historical property and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Damage or graffiti to certain historical property and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-02-14HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2023-11-14HouseReceived from Senate
2023-11-14SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2023-11-14SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 10
2023-11-14SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2023-11-14SenateOrdered to a third reading
2023-11-14SenateRead a second time
2023-11-14SenatePlaced on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023
2023-11-13SenatePlaced on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2023-11-10SenateAvailable for scheduling
2023-11-10SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2
2023-11-10SenateExecutive action taken
2023-11-02SenatePublic hearing held
2023-11-02SenateSenator Wanggaard added as a coauthor
2023-10-23SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-10-23SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback