WI SB551 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 323.72 (5); to amend 323.72 (title), 323.72 (1), 323.72 (2), 323.72 (3), 323.72 (4) and 895.483 (4); and to create 20.465 (3) (dv), 20.465 (3) (hm), 40.05 (2) (aw), 40.06 (8), 323.72 (2m) and 323.72 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: a statewide urban search and rescue task force and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A statewide urban search and rescue task force and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Representative Born added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb551 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB551.pdf |