WI SB551 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.091 (1), 29.161 (2), 29.164 (2) (b), 29.173 (2) (a), 29.182 (3) (a), 29.182 (3) (b), 29.184 (3) (c), 29.185 (6) (a) 1., 29.185 (6) (b), 29.193 (2) (d), 29.204 (2), 29.207 (2), 29.211 (2), 29.213 (2), 29.304 (title), 29.304 (1) (a), 29.304 (1) (b), 29.304 (2) (b) (intro.), 29.304 (2) (b) 2., 29.304 (3) (b) (intro.), 29.304 (3) (b) 2., 29.304 (5) (a), 29.304 (5) (b) 2., 29.312 (2), 29.314 (3) (a), 29.314 (3) (b) 4., 29.314 (4) (a), 29.324 (1) (b), 29.324 (1) (c), 29.592 (1) (intro.), 29.592 (3) and 29.621 (4) (intro.); and to create 29.001 (5), 29.001 (41s) and 29.014 (1s) of the statutes; Relating to: hunting with a high-powered air rifle or an airbow and providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Hunting with a high-powered air rifle or an airbow and providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Moulton [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Rep. David Crowley [D] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Moulton |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb551 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB551.pdf |