WI SB55 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Published 8-17-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Published 8-17-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.1105 (4e) (a) 4. of the statutes; relating to: expanding the number of tax incremental financing districts that may be designated as distressed or severely distressed. (FE)
Title
Expanding the number of tax incremental financing districts that may be designated as distressed or severely distressed. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-05 | Senate | Published 8-17-2011 |
2011-08-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-3-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 41 |
2011-08-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2011 |
2011-07-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 7-25-2011 |
2011-07-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2011-07-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-07-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2011-07-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-20 | House | Read a second time |
2011-07-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to Calendar of 7-20-2011 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2011-07-14 | House | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2011-07-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-06-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means |
2011-06-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-06-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-8-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-06-07 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Introduced |