WI SB547 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 108.04 (7) (h), 108.14 (8n) (e) and 108.141 (7) (a); and to create 108.04 (5m) and 108.04 (7) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility for unemployment insurance benefits in the case of an unwillingness to receive a vaccine. (FE)
Title
Eligibility for unemployment insurance benefits in the case of an unwillingness to receive a vaccine. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Representative Dittrich added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Representative Behnke added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Introduced |