WI SB545 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 94.55 (2t), 961.11 (4g), 961.14 (4) (t), 961.32 (2m), 961.38 (1n), 961.41 (1) (h), 961.41 (1m) (h), 961.41 (1q), 961.41 (3g) (e), 961.571 (1) (a) 7., 961.571 (1) (a) 11. e., 961.571 (1) (a) 11. k. and L. and 967.055 (1m) (b) 5.; to renumber and amend 115.35 (1), 961.01 (14) and 961.34; to amend 20.115 (7) (gc), 49.148 (4) (a), 49.79 (1) (b), 59.54 (25) (title), 59.54 (25) (a) (intro.), 66.0107 (1) (bm), 111.35 (2) (e), 114.09 (2) (bm) 1. (intro.), 114.09 (2) (bm) 4., 157.06 (11) (i), 289.33 (3) (d), 349.02 (2) (b) 4., 961.41 (1r), 961.41 (1x), 961.41 (3g) (c), 961.41 (3g) (d), 961.41 (3g) (em), 961.47 (1), 961.48 (3), 961.48 (5), 961.49 (1m) (intro.), 961.571 (1) (a) 11. (intro.), 971.365 (1) (a), 971.365 (1) (b), 971.365 (1) (c) and 971.365 (2); and to create 16.282, 20.115 (7) (ge), 20.192 (1) (t), 20.255 (2) (r), 20.435 (1) (r), 20.437 (3) (r), 20.505 (1) (t), 20.566 (1) (bn), 20.835 (2) (eq), 25.316, 48.47 (20), 66.04185, 73.17, 77.54 (71), 94.56, 94.57, 100.145, 108.02 (18r), 108.04 (5m), 111.32 (9m), 111.32 (11m), subchapter IV of chapter 139 [precedes 139.97], 157.06 (11) (hm), 238.139, 250.22, subchapter VIII of chapter 961 [precedes 961.70] and 973.016 of the statutes; Relating to: legalizing recreational marijuana, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Legalizing recreational marijuana, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Representative Milroy added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Introduced |