WI SB536 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 173.29, 938.3416, 941.293, 971.17 (1i) and 973.0336 of the statutes; Relating to: possession of dogs by certain felony offenders and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Possession of dogs by certain felony offenders and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Calvin Callahan [R] |
Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-25 | House | Representative Milroy added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Introduced |