WI SB534 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 971.16 (1); to renumber and amend 455.03; to amend 16.417 (1) (e) 4., 48.375 (2) (c), 48.375 (4) (b) 1m., 49.45 (30f), 49.45 (30j) (a) 1., 50.06 (4), 51.03 (6) (a), 51.15 (2) (c), 146.34 (1) (i), 146.81 (1) (h), 146.997 (1) (d) 10., 155.01 (1g) (a), 155.01 (7), 165.77 (1) (a), 244.09 (3) (a), 252.14 (1) (ar) 6., 440.03 (13) (b) (intro.), 440.03 (13) (c), 440.15, 446.01 (1v) (L), 450.10 (3) (a) 9., chapter 455 (title), 455.01 (intro.), 455.02 (2m) (intro.), 455.02 (2m) (f), 455.02 (2m) (p), 455.03 (title), 455.06 (1) (a) and (2), 455.09 (1) (intro.), 455.09 (1) (c), 455.09 (1) (d), 455.09 (1) (g), 455.09 (3), 455.11, 457.02 (3), 632.89 (1) (e) 3., 905.04 (1) (e), 939.615 (6) (e) and 971.17 (7) (c); to repeal and recreate 302.384 (1m); and to create 14.89, 440.03 (11m) (c) 2s., subchapter I (title) of chapter 455 [precedes 455.01], 455.01 (1), 455.01 (2m), 455.01 (3r), 455.01 (9), 455.03 (2), 455.03 (3), subchapter II of chapter 455 [precedes 455.50], 455.51 and 990.01 (31m) of the statutes; Relating to: ratification of the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senators Stafsholt and L. Taylor added as coauthors |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Representative Dittrich added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Introduced |