WI SB531 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 452.15; to amend 452.01 (4), 452.025 (5) (b), 452.12 (3) and 452.14 (3) (intro.); and to create 440.03 (13) (bm), 452.01 (3p), 452.01 (4v), 452.05 (1) (h), 452.05 (1) (i), 452.07 (2), 452.12 (5) (d), 452.139 (3), 452.14 (2m), 452.14 (3) (o), 452.14 (3m), 452.14 (4r), 452.15 (2) and 452.25 of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility for a broker's or salesperson's license or a time-share salesperson's certificate of registration following a criminal conviction, immunity for employing real estate brokers in certain actions, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Eligibility for a broker's or salesperson's license or a time-share salesperson's certificate of registration following a criminal conviction, immunity for employing real estate brokers in certain actions, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Farrow [R] | Sen. Dale Schultz [R] | Rep. Dean Knudson [R] | Rep. John Murtha [R] |
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 288 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 81, Noes 15 |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2014-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Farrow |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lasee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Housing |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced |