WI SB527 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.435 (7) (bc) of the statutes; Relating to: grants for Alzheimer's disease and dementia awareness and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for Alzheimer's disease and dementia awareness and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Representative Zepnick added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Moulton |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb527 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB527.pdf |